UT SB0228 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-03 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-03 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Property Amendments
Title
Property Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-27 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate Secretary |
2023-03-03 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2023-03-03 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2023-02-28 | House | House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules in House Rules Committee |
2023-02-28 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2023-02-28 | House | House/ committee report favorable in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2023-02-27 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2023-02-27 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2023-02-26 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2023-02-24 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2023-02-24 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2023-02-24 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2023-02-24 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2023-02-24 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ substituted from # 0 to # 2 in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2023-02-13 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2023-02-13 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Local Taxation and Fees
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
Property Tax
Property Tax Collection
Real Estate
Real Property
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
Property Tax
Property Tax Collection
Real Estate
Real Property
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 4 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63G | 2 | 202 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63G | 2 | 302 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63I | 1 | 257 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63I | 1 | 263 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |