UT SB0211S01 | 2013 | Regular Session
Note: Replaces legislation SB0211
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-22 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-22 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Redevelopment Agency Amendments
Title
Redevelopment Agency Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-14 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee - Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - Senate - Senate Motion to Adopt Joint Conference Comm Rpt (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - House - House Conference Committee - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - House - House Motion to Adopt Joint Conference Comm Rpt (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - House - House/ refused to recede from House amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - Senate - Senate/ refuse to concur with House amendments (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - House - House/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - House - House/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - House - House/ motion to reconsider (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-08 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2013-03-14 - Senate - Senate Motion to Adopt Joint Conference Comm Rpt (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - House - House Conference Committee - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - House - House Motion to Adopt Joint Conference Comm Rpt (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - House - House/ refused to recede from House amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - Senate - Senate/ refuse to concur with House amendments (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - House - House/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - House - House/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - House - House/ motion to reconsider (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-08 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-22 | Governor Signed in ELTGOV | |
2013-03-20 | Senate/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in SSEC |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in SSEC |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in SSEC |
2013-03-19 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2013-03-14 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2013-03-14 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in SPRES |
2013-03-14 | Senate | House/ to Senate in SPRES |
2013-03-14 | Senate | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in SPRES |
2013-03-14 | House | House/ received from Senate in HSPKR |
2013-03-14 | House | Senate/ to House in HSPKR |
2013-03-14 | House | Senate Conference Committee - Final Passage in HSPKR |
2013-03-14 | Senate Motion to Adopt Joint Conference Comm Rpt in CONCOM | |
2013-03-14 | Senate/ received from House in CONCOM | |
2013-03-14 | House/ to Senate in CONCOM | |
2013-03-14 | House Conference Committee - Final Passage in CONCOM | |
2013-03-14 | House Motion to Adopt Joint Conference Comm Rpt in CONCOM | |
2013-03-14 | House/ received from Senate in CONCOM | |
2013-03-14 | Senate/ to House in CONCOM | |
2013-03-14 | Senate Conference Committee Appointed in CONCOM | |
2013-03-14 | Senate/ received from House in CONCOM | |
2013-03-14 | House/ to Senate in CONCOM | |
2013-03-14 | House Conference Committee Appointed in CONCOM | |
2013-03-14 | House | House/ refused to recede from House amendment in HCLERK |
2013-03-14 | House | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK |
2013-03-14 | House | Senate/ to House in HCLERK |
2013-03-14 | House | Senate/ refuse to concur with House amendments in HCLERK |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in SCURCAL |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in SSEC |
2013-03-14 | Senate | House/ to Senate in SSEC |
2013-03-14 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC |
2013-03-14 | House | House/ floor amendment in H3RDSB |
2013-03-14 | House | House/ floor amendment in H3RDSB |
2013-03-14 | House | House/ placed back on 3rd Reading Calendar in H3RDSB |
2013-03-14 | House | House/ motion to reconsider in HCLERK |
2013-03-14 | Senate | House/ to Senate in SPRES |
2013-03-14 | Senate | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in SPRES |
2013-03-14 | House | House/ passed 3rd reading in HSPKR |
2013-03-14 | House | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDSB |
2013-03-12 | House | House/ 2nd reading/ suspension in H3RDSB |
2013-03-12 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in H3RDSB |
2013-03-11 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2013-03-11 | House | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK |
2013-03-11 | House | Senate/ to House in HCLERK |
2013-03-11 | House | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in HCLERK |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ floor amendment in S2ND |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in S2ND |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Senate/ circled in S2ND |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in S2ND |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in SSTEDW |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SSTEDU |
2013-02-28 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTEDW |
2013-02-28 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SSTEDW |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in SSTEDW |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTEDW |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation in SSTEDW |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SSTEDW |
2013-02-26 | Senate | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in SSTEDW |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTEDW |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO |
2013-02-20 | Numbered Bill Publically Distributed in LRGC | |
2013-02-20 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Same As/Similar To
SB0211 (Replaces) 2013-02-28 - Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in SSUB