UT SB0200S01 | 2013 | Regular Session
Note: Legislation replaced by SB0200S02
Note: Replaces legislation SB0200
Note: Replaces legislation SB0200
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-05 - Senate/ substituted in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-05 - Senate/ substituted in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Local and Special Service Districts Amendments
Title
Local and Special Service Districts Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-05 - Senate - Senate/ substituted (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2013-03-05 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ substituted in SSUB |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in S2ND |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ circled in S2ND |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in S2ND |
2013-02-21 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in S2ND |
2013-02-21 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in S2ND |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in SSTGOP |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTGOP |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation in SSTGOP |
2013-02-20 | Senate | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in SSTGOP |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTGOP |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SSTRUL |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO |
2013-02-15 | Numbered Bill Publically Distributed in LRGC | |
2013-02-15 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Same As/Similar To
SB0200S02 (Replaced by) 2013-03-07 - LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSUB
SB0200 (Replaces) 2013-02-21 - Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in SSUB
SB0200 (Replaces) 2013-02-21 - Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in SSUB