UT SB0198 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-15 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-15 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Human Services Fund and Account Amendments
Title
Human Services Fund and Account Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-03 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 70 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-10 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-10 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-15 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2023-03-13 | Senate/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Senate Secretary |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary |
2023-03-06 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2023-03-06 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2023-03-03 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2023-03-03 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2023-03-03 | Senate | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President |
2023-03-03 | House | House/ passed 3rd reading in House Speaker |
2023-03-03 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2023-03-03 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2023-02-28 | House | House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules in House Rules Committee |
2023-02-27 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2023-02-27 | House | House/ committee report favorable in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2023-02-24 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2023-02-22 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2023-02-21 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2023-02-21 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2023-02-21 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2023-02-21 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2023-02-21 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2023-02-21 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate/ substituted from # 0 to # 1 in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2023-02-08 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2023-02-08 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Department of Health and Human Services
Disabilities
Health
Health Care
Health Care Facilities
Human Services
Human Services Facilities
Human Services Licensure
Human Services Programs
Office of Licensing
Services for People with Disabilities
Skilled Nursing Facilities
Disabilities
Health
Health Care
Health Care Facilities
Human Services
Human Services Facilities
Human Services Licensure
Human Services Programs
Office of Licensing
Services for People with Disabilities
Skilled Nursing Facilities