UT SB0195 | 2021 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Emergency Response Amendments
Title
Emergency Response Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-05 - Senate - Senate/ concurs with House amendment (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 68 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 2 to # 3 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 68 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 2 to # 3 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-24 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2021-03-17 | Senate/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-09 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-03-09 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-03-05 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2021-03-05 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2021-03-05 | Senate | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President |
2021-03-05 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2021-03-05 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2021-03-05 | House | Senate/ concurs with House amendment in House Speaker |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in Senate Concurrence Calendar |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-04 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-04 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-04 | House | House/ floor amendment # 3 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2021-03-04 | House | House/ substitute adoption failed from # 3 to # 4 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2021-03-04 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2021-03-04 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2021-03-04 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2021-03-02 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2021-03-02 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Rules Committee |
2021-03-02 | House | House/ return to Rules due to fiscal impact in House Rules Committee |
2021-03-02 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended in House Substituted Bill |
2021-03-01 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Government Operations Committee |
2021-03-01 | House | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in House Government Operations Committee |
2021-03-01 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 2 to # 3 in House Government Operations Committee |
2021-02-25 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Government Operations Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2021-02-23 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2021-02-23 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Senate/ floor amendment # 1 in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ substituted from # 1 to # 2 in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2021-02-12 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-02-12 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Administrative Rulemaking
Administrative Rulemaking and Procedures
Constitutional Officers
Counties
County Officers
Department of Health
Diseases Control and Prevention
Emergency Management
Emergency Medical Services and Preparedness
Emergency Powers
Government Operations (State Issues)
Governor
Health
Legislative Committees and Task Forces
Legislative Operations
Legislative Organization
Legislative Oversight of Administrative Rules
Local Government Ordinances
Local Health Departments
Municipal Officers
Municipalities
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
Public Health
Public Safety
Rulemaking Procedures
Administrative Rulemaking and Procedures
Constitutional Officers
Counties
County Officers
Department of Health
Diseases Control and Prevention
Emergency Management
Emergency Medical Services and Preparedness
Emergency Powers
Government Operations (State Issues)
Governor
Health
Legislative Committees and Task Forces
Legislative Operations
Legislative Organization
Legislative Oversight of Administrative Rules
Local Government Ordinances
Local Health Departments
Municipal Officers
Municipalities
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
Public Health
Public Safety
Rulemaking Procedures
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
26 | 1 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
26 | 1 | 30 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
26 | 23 | 6 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
26 | 6 | 2 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
26 | 6 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
26A | 1 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
26A | 1 | 114 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
26A | 1 | 121 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63G | 3 | 304 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63G | 3 | 501 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63G | 3 | 502 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |