UT SB0189 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-03 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-03 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Voting Changes
Title
Voting Changes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Rules Committee |
2023-02-13 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Rules Committee |
2023-02-12 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate Rules Committee |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2023-02-07 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2023-02-07 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2023-02-07 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Election Administration
Election Law
Notice Requirements
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
Voting and Voter Registration
Election Law
Notice Requirements
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
Voting and Voter Registration
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2023/bills/static/SB0189.html |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2023/bills/sbillint/SB0189.pdf |
Supplement | https://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2023/SB0189.fn.pdf |