UT SB0178 | 2022 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Electronic Voting Exploratory Commission
Title
Electronic Voting Exploratory Commission
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Senate Comm - Returned to Rules in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2022-02-08 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2022-02-08 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2022-02-04 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-02-04 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-02-04 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Agency Technology Services and Public Websites
Boards and Committees
Counties
Data and Cyber Security
Division of Technology Services
Election Law
Electronic Information
Electronic Privacy
Electronic Transactions
Government Operations (State Issues)
Internet Protocols
Legislative Committees and Task Forces
Legislative Employees and Compensation
Legislative Operations
Legislative Organization
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
Public Utilities and Technology
Technology
Voting and Voter Registration
Boards and Committees
Counties
Data and Cyber Security
Division of Technology Services
Election Law
Electronic Information
Electronic Privacy
Electronic Transactions
Government Operations (State Issues)
Internet Protocols
Legislative Committees and Task Forces
Legislative Employees and Compensation
Legislative Operations
Legislative Organization
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
Public Utilities and Technology
Technology
Voting and Voter Registration
Code Citations
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2022/bills/static/SB0178.html |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2022/bills/sbillint/SB0178.pdf |
Supplement | https://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2022/SB0178.fn.pdf |