UT SB0158 | 2021 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-05 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-05 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Children's Health Coverage Amendments
Title
Children's Health Coverage Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-26 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 20 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-05 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-05 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2021-03-01 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2021-03-01 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2021-02-26 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2021-02-26 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ floor amendment # 2 in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ amended in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Rules Committee |
2021-02-09 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Rules Committee |
2021-02-08 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate Rules Committee |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2021-02-03 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-02-03 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-02-03 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Children's Health Insurance Program
Community Health Clinics
Department of Health
Education
Government Operations (State Issues)
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Insurance
Immigration
K-12 Education
Labor & Employment
Medicaid
Public Funds and Accounts
Community Health Clinics
Department of Health
Education
Government Operations (State Issues)
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Insurance
Immigration
K-12 Education
Labor & Employment
Medicaid
Public Funds and Accounts