UT SB0145 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-03 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-03 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Higher Education for Incarcerated Youth Program Amendments
Title
Higher Education for Incarcerated Youth Program Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate Secretary |
2023-03-03 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2023-03-03 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2023-02-09 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2023-02-08 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2023-02-08 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2023-02-07 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Clerk of the House |
2023-02-07 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2023-02-07 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Senate/ substituted from # 0 to # 1 in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Education Committee |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Education Committee |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Education Committee |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Education Committee |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2023-01-26 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2023-01-26 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Education
Inmates
Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice
Online Learning and/or Technology
Standards and Curriculum
State Board of Education
Inmates
Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice
Online Learning and/or Technology
Standards and Curriculum
State Board of Education
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
53B | 31 | 301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
53E | 10 | 301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
53E | 3 | 503 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |