UT SB0122 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 15 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - Senate/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 15 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - Senate/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Eminent Domain Revisions
Title
Eminent Domain Revisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-19 - Senate - Senate/ concurs with House amendment (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-02-17 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-17 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | Senate/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2010-03-15 | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in SSEC | |
2010-02-23 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2010-02-22 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2010-02-19 | House/ to Senate in SPRES | |
2010-02-19 | House/ received from Senate in HSPKR | |
2010-02-19 | Senate/ concurs with House amendment in HSPKR | |
2010-02-18 | Senate/ received from House in SSEC | |
2010-02-18 | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC | |
2010-02-18 | House/ motion to reconsider passed in H3RDSB | |
2010-02-18 | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC | |
2010-02-17 | House/ 2nd reading in H3RDSB | |
2010-02-17 | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTTRA | |
2010-02-11 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2010-02-10 | Senate/ to House in HCLERK | |
2010-02-10 | Senate/ floor amendment in S3RD | |
2010-02-09 | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in S3RD | |
2010-02-08 | Senate/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in S2ND | |
2010-02-05 | Senate/ committee report favorable in SSTREV | |
2010-02-05 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTREV | |
2010-02-04 | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTREV | |
2010-02-02 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2010-02-01 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2010-02-01 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |