UT SB0109 | 2013 | Regular Session
Note: Legislation replaced by SB0109S01
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-15 - Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-15 - Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change Application Procedure
Title
Change Application Procedure
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-15 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in SSUB |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in SSTNAE |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation in SSTNAE |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Senate Comm - Held in SSTNAE |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Senate Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed in SSTNAE |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Senate Comm - Held in SSTNAE |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Senate Comm - Not Considered in SSTNAE |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTNAE |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2013-01-25 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SINTRO |
2013-01-23 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SINTRO |
2013-01-23 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SINTRO |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO |
2013-01-16 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2013-01-16 | Numbered Bill Publically Distributed in LRGC | |
2013-01-16 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Same As/Similar To
SB0109S01 (Replaced by) 2013-03-14 - House/ substituted in HSUB