UT SB0109S01 | 2013 | Regular Session
Note: Replaces legislation SB0109
Note: Legislation replaced by SB0109S04
Note: Legislation replaced by SB0109S04
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-14 - House/ substituted in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-14 - House/ substituted in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change Application Procedure
Title
Change Application Procedure
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-14 - House - House/ substituted (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - House - House/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - House - House/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 19 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 21 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-14 - House - House/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - House - House/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 19 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 21 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-14 | House | House/ substituted in HSUB |
2013-03-14 | House | House/ uncircled in H3RDSB |
2013-03-12 | House | House/ circled in H3RDSB |
2013-03-12 | House | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDSB |
2013-03-11 | House | House/ 2nd reading/ suspension in H3RDSB |
2013-03-11 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in H3RDSB |
2013-02-26 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2013-02-26 | House | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK |
2013-02-26 | House | Senate/ to House in HCLERK |
2013-02-26 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in HCLERK |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in S3RD |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in S3RD |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in SSPEC |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ placed on Time Certain Calendar in SSPEC |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in S2ND |
2013-02-19 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in S2ND |
2013-02-18 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in S2ND |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in SSTNAE |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in SSTNAE |
2013-02-14 | Senate | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in SSTNAE |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTNAE |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation in SSTNAE |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Senate Comm - Held in SSTNAE |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Senate Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed in SSTNAE |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Senate Comm - Held in SSTNAE |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Senate Comm - Not Considered in SSTNAE |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTNAE |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2013-01-25 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SINTRO |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO |
2013-01-16 | Numbered Bill Publically Distributed in LRGC | |
2013-01-16 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Same As/Similar To
SB0109 (Replaces) 2013-02-15 - Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in SSUB
SB0109S04 (Replaced by) 2013-03-14 - Senate/ filed in SFILE
SB0109S04 (Replaced by) 2013-03-14 - Senate/ filed in SFILE