UT SB0098 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-26 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Propelling a Bodily Substance Revisions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Propelling a Bodily Substance Revisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-03-06 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-26 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 18 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-26 Governor Signed in ELTGOV
2013-03-21 Senate/ to Governor in EGOV
2013-03-21SenateSenate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in SSEC
2013-03-21SenateSenate/ enrolled bill to Printing in SSEC
2013-03-21SenateEnrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in SSEC
2013-03-07 Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN
2013-03-06 Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in LRGCEN
2013-03-06 Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN
2013-03-06SenateSenate/ received from House in SPRES
2013-03-06SenateHouse/ to Senate in SPRES
2013-03-06SenateHouse/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in SPRES
2013-03-06HouseHouse/ passed 3rd reading in HSPKR
2013-03-06HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in HCON
2013-03-04HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in HCON
2013-03-04HouseHouse/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in HSTLAW
2013-03-04HouseHouse Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in HSTLAW
2013-03-04HouseHouse Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTLAW
2013-02-28HouseHouse/ to standing committee in HSTLAW
2013-02-27HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL
2013-02-26HouseHouse/ received from Senate in HCLERK
2013-02-26HouseSenate/ to House in HCLERK
2013-02-26HouseSenate/ passed 3rd reading in HCLERK
2013-02-26SenateSenate/ uncircled in S3RD
2013-02-26SenateSenate/ circled in S3RD
2013-02-26SenateSenate/ 3rd reading in S3RD
2013-02-25SenateSenate/ passed 2nd reading in S3RD
2013-02-25SenateSenate/ 2nd reading in S2ND
2013-02-07SenateSenate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND
2013-02-07SenateSenate/ committee report favorable in SSTJLC
2013-02-06SenateSenate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTJLC
2013-02-06SenateSenate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SSTJLC
2013-02-05SenateLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTJLC
2013-02-05SenateLFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SSTJLC
2013-02-05SenateSenate/ to standing committee in SSTJLC
2013-02-04SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL
2013-02-01SenateSenate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO
2013-02-01 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC
2013-02-01 Numbered Bill Publically Distributed in LRGC
2013-02-01 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback