UT SB0098 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-01-27 - Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted/ Consent Calendar in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Securities Related Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Securities Related Amendments

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-01-27 Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted/ Consent Calendar in SSUB
2011-01-27 Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation in SSTBUS
2011-01-24 Senate/ to standing committee in SSTBUS
2011-01-24 Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL
2011-01-06 Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note in LRGC
2011-01-05 LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in LRGC
2010-12-21 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC
2010-12-06 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback