UT SB0086 | 2021 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-16 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-16 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amendments to the Price Controls During Emergencies Act
Title
Amendments to the Price Controls During Emergencies Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-04 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-16 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2021-03-15 | Senate/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-09 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-03-09 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-03-05 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2021-03-04 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2021-03-04 | Senate | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President |
2021-03-04 | House | House/ passed 3rd reading in House Speaker |
2021-03-04 | House | House/ uncircled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2021-02-25 | House | House/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2021-02-25 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2021-02-24 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2021-02-24 | House | House/ committee report favorable in House Business and Labor Committee |
2021-02-23 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Business and Labor Committee |
2021-02-12 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Business and Labor Committee |
2021-02-05 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2021-02-05 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2021-02-05 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2021-02-05 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2021-01-28 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2 in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2021-01-12 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-01-12 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
13 | 2 | 6 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
13 | 41 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
13 | 41 | 201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
13 | 41 | 202 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |