UT SB0080 | 2019 | General Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Traffic Pattern Amendments
Title
Traffic Pattern Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate Comm - Held (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Senate Comm - Returned to Rules in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Senate Comm - Held in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Senate Comm - Held in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2019-01-26 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2019-01-18 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2019-01-18 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2019-01-18 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |