UT SB0074 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - Senate/ filed in SFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - Senate/ filed in SFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Career and Technical Education Funding for Charter Schools
Title
Career and Technical Education Funding for Charter Schools
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate/ filed in SFILE |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in SSEC |
2014-03-13 | Senate | House/ to Senate in SSEC |
2014-03-13 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in HCLERK |
2014-03-13 | House | House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules in HSTRUL |
2014-03-13 | House | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDSB |
2014-03-12 | House | House/ 2nd suspended in H3RDSB |
2014-03-12 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in H3RDSB |
2014-03-10 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2014-03-10 | House | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK |
2014-03-10 | House | Senate/ to House in HCLERK |
2014-03-10 | House | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in HCLERK |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senate/ floor amendment in S2ND |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in S2ND |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Senate/ circled in S2ND |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in S2ND |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in SSTEDU |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SSTEDU |
2014-02-27 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTEDU |
2014-02-27 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SSTEDU |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTEDU |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTEDU |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO |
2014-02-24 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2014-02-24 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in LRGC | |
2014-02-24 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |