UT SB0073 | 2022 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Flow Rates or Quantity for Plumbing Fixtures
Title
Flow Rates or Quantity for Plumbing Fixtures
Sponsors
Sen. Jani Iwamoto [D] | Rep. Joel Ferry [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 21 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 21 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate Secretary |
2022-03-04 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2022-03-04 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2022-03-02 | House | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in House Rules Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | House Comm - Returned to Rules in House Business and Labor Committee |
2022-02-15 | House | House Comm - Not Considered in House Business and Labor Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Business and Labor Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2022-01-26 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2022-01-26 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2022-01-26 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2022-01-14 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2022-01-06 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-01-06 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-01-06 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15A | 3 | 205 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
15A | 3 | 306 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |