UT SB0072S04 | 2013 | Regular Session
Note: Legislation replaced by SB0072S06
Note: Replaces legislation SB0072S02
Note: Replaces legislation SB0072S02
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-13 - House/ substituted in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-13 - House/ substituted in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prison Relocation and Development Amendments
Title
Prison Relocation and Development Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-13 - House - House/ substituted (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 19 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - Senate - Senate/ substituted (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - Senate - Senate/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - Senate - Senate/ floor amendment (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - Senate - Senate/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - Senate - Senate/ floor amendment failed (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-04 - Senate - Senate/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 18 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-03-05 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 19 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - Senate - Senate/ substituted (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - Senate - Senate/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - Senate - Senate/ floor amendment (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - Senate - Senate/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - Senate - Senate/ floor amendment failed (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-04 - Senate - Senate/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 18 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-13 | House | House/ substituted in HSUB |
2013-03-13 | House | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDSB |
2013-03-12 | House | House/ 2nd reading/ suspension in H3RDSB |
2013-03-12 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in H3RDSB |
2013-03-11 | House | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HSTRUL |
2013-03-11 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL |
2013-03-11 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTRUL |
2013-03-06 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2013-03-06 | House | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK |
2013-03-05 | House | Senate/ to House in HCLERK |
2013-03-05 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in HCLERK |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ substituted in S3RD |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in S3RD |
2013-03-05 | Senate | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in S3RD |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ circled in S3RD |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ floor amendment in S3RD |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ floor amendment in S3RD |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ floor amendment in S3RD |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ floor amendment in S3RD |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ floor amendment failed in S3RD |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ floor amendment in S3RD |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in S3RD |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ circled in S3RD |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ floor amendment in S3RD |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in S3RD |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in S3RD |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended in SSTJLC |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SSTJLC |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTJLC |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation in SSTJLC |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in SSTJLC |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Senate Comm - Held in SSTJLC |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation in SSTJLC |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SSTJLC |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in SSTJLC |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Senate Comm - Held in SSTJLC |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation in SSTJLC |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTJLC |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO |
2013-02-13 | Numbered Bill Publically Distributed in LRGC | |
2013-02-13 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Same As/Similar To
SB0072S06 (Replaced by) 2013-03-14 - Bill Substituted by Conference Committee in HSUB
SB0072S02 (Replaces) 2013-03-05 - Senate/ substituted in SSUB
SB0072S02 (Replaces) 2013-03-05 - Senate/ substituted in SSUB
Subjects
Business
Department of Corrections
Government Operations (State Issues)
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
Real Estate
Revenue and Taxation
Department of Corrections
Government Operations (State Issues)
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
Real Estate
Revenue and Taxation