UT SB0072S01 | 2013 | Regular Session
Note: Legislation replaced by SB0072S02
Note: Replaces legislation SB0072
Note: Replaces legislation SB0072
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-28 - Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-28 - Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prison Relocation and Development Amendments
Title
Prison Relocation and Development Amendments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SSUB |
2013-02-27 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTJLC |
2013-02-27 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SSTJLC |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in SSTJLC |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation in SSTJLC |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SSTJLC |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in SSTJLC |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Senate Comm - Held in SSTJLC |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation in SSTJLC |
2013-02-19 | Senate | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in SSTJLC |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTJLC |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO |
2013-02-13 | Numbered Bill Publically Distributed in LRGC | |
2013-02-13 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Same As/Similar To
SB0072S02 (Replaced by) 2013-03-05 - Senate/ substituted in SSUB
SB0072 (Replaces) 2013-02-28 - Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended in SSUB
SB0072 (Replaces) 2013-02-28 - Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended in SSUB
Subjects
Business
Department of Corrections
Government Operations (State Issues)
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
Real Estate
Revenue and Taxation
Department of Corrections
Government Operations (State Issues)
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
Real Estate
Revenue and Taxation
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2013/htmdoc/sbillhtm/SB0072S01.htm |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2013/bills/sbillint/sb0072s01.pdf |