UT SB0064S01 | 2013 | Regular Session

Note: Replaces legislation SB0064

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-01 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Homeowner Association Reserve Account Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Homeowner Association Reserve Account Amendments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-03-12 - Senate - Senate/ concurs with House amendment (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 65 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - House - House/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-03-05 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-01 Governor Signed in ELTGOV
2013-03-25 Senate/ to Governor in EGOV
2013-03-25SenateSenate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in SSEC
2013-03-21SenateSenate/ enrolled bill to Printing in SSEC
2013-03-21SenateEnrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in SSEC
2013-03-13 Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN
2013-03-12 Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in LRGCEN
2013-03-12 Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN
2013-03-12SenateSenate/ received from House in SPRES
2013-03-12SenateHouse/ to Senate in SPRES
2013-03-12SenateHouse/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in SPRES
2013-03-12HouseHouse/ received from Senate in HSPKR
2013-03-12HouseSenate/ to House in HSPKR
2013-03-12HouseSenate/ concurs with House amendment in HSPKR
2013-03-12SenateSenate/ uncircled in SCURCAL
2013-03-12SenateSenate/ circled in SCURCAL
2013-03-12SenateSenate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in SCURCAL
2013-03-12SenateSenate/ received from House in SSEC
2013-03-12SenateHouse/ to Senate in SSEC
2013-03-12SenateHouse/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC
2013-03-12HouseHouse/ floor amendment in H3RDSB
2013-03-12HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in H3RDSB
2013-03-11HouseHouse/ 2nd reading/ suspension in H3RDSB
2013-03-11HouseHouse/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in H3RDSB
2013-03-11HouseHouse/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules in HSTRUL
2013-03-07HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in H3RDSB
2013-03-07HouseHouse/ committee report favorable in HSTPUT
2013-03-06HouseHouse Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTPUT
2013-03-05HouseHouse/ to standing committee in HSTPUT
2013-03-05HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL
2013-03-05HouseHouse/ received from Senate in HCLERK
2013-03-05HouseSenate/ to House in HCLERK
2013-03-05HouseSenate/ passed 3rd reading in HCLERK
2013-03-05SenateSenate/ uncircled in S3RD
2013-03-05SenateSenate/ circled in S3RD
2013-03-05SenateSenate/ 3rd reading in S3RD
2013-03-04SenateSenate/ passed 2nd reading in S3RD
2013-03-04SenateSenate/ uncircled in S2ND
2013-03-04SenateSenate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in S2ND
2013-03-01SenateLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in S2ND
2013-03-01SenateLFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in S2ND
2013-02-28SenateSenate/ circled in S2ND
2013-02-28SenateSenate/ substituted in S2ND
2013-02-28SenateSenate/ uncircled in S2ND
2013-02-28SenateLFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in S2ND
2013-02-26SenateSenate/ circled in S2ND
2013-02-26SenateSenate/ 2nd reading in S2ND
2013-02-19SenateSenate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND
2013-02-19SenateSenate/ comm rpt/ amended in SSTBUS
2013-02-14SenateSenate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTBUS
2013-02-14SenateSenate Comm - Amendment Recommendation in SSTBUS
2013-02-08SenateSenate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SSTBUS
2013-02-07SenateSenate Comm - Not Considered in SSTBUS
2013-02-07SenateSenate/ to standing committee in SSTBUS
2013-02-06SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL
2013-02-06SenateSenate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO
2013-02-06 Numbered Bill Publically Distributed in LRGC
2013-02-06 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC

Same As/Similar To

SB0064 (Replaces) 2013-02-28 - Senate/ substituted in SSUB

Subjects


Utah State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://le.utah.gov/~2013/htmdoc/sbillhtm/SB0064S01.htm
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2013/bills/sbillint/sb0064s01.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2013/bills/sbillamd/sb0064s01.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2013/bills/sbillenr/sb0064.pdf
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/asp/votes/comvotes.asp?sessionid=2013GS&voteid=2285&sequence=15796
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=678&house=S&sessionid=2013GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=756&house=S&sessionid=2013GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=758&house=S&sessionid=2013GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=858&house=S&sessionid=2013GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=859&house=S&sessionid=2013GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=931&house=S&sessionid=2013GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=939&house=S&sessionid=2013GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=940&house=S&sessionid=2013GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/asp/votes/comvotes.asp?sessionid=2013GS&voteid=2790&sequence=20618
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=979&house=H&sessionid=2013GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=980&house=H&sessionid=2013GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=1489&house=S&sessionid=2013GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=1490&house=S&sessionid=2013GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=1492&house=S&sessionid=2013GS

Bill Comments

feedback