UT SB0064 | 2013 | Regular Session
Note: Legislation replaced by SB0064S01
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-28 - Senate/ substituted in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-28 - Senate/ substituted in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Homeowner Association Reserve Account Amendments
Title
Homeowner Association Reserve Account Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-28 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2013-02-26 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ substituted in SSUB |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in S2ND |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ circled in S2ND |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ amended in SSTBUS |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTBUS |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation in SSTBUS |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SSTBUS |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Senate Comm - Not Considered in SSTBUS |
2013-02-07 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTBUS |
2013-02-07 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SSTBUS |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTBUS |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO |
2013-02-06 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2013-02-06 | Numbered Bill Publically Distributed in LRGC | |
2013-02-06 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Same As/Similar To
SB0064S01 (Replaced by) 2013-04-01 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV