UT SB0059S01 | 2013 | Regular Session
Note: Legislation replaced by SB0059S02
Note: Replaces legislation SB0059
Note: Replaces legislation SB0059
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-12 - House/ substituted in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-12 - House/ substituted in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Workers' Compensation Coordination of Benefits Amendments
Title
Workers' Compensation Coordination of Benefits Amendments
Sponsors
Sen. Karen Mayne [D] | Sen. Don Ipson [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-12 - House - House/ substituted (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - House - House/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2013-03-05 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2013-03-12 - House - House/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2013-03-05 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-12 | House | House/ substituted in HSUB |
2013-03-12 | House | House/ uncircled in H3RDSB |
2013-03-12 | House | House/ circled in H3RDSB |
2013-03-12 | House | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDSB |
2013-03-11 | House | House/ 2nd reading/ suspension in H3RDSB |
2013-03-11 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in H3RDSB |
2013-03-11 | House | House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules in HSTRUL |
2013-03-07 | House | House/ 2nd reading in H3RDSB |
2013-03-07 | House | House/ committee report favorable in HSTEDU |
2013-03-06 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTEDU |
2013-03-05 | House | House/ to standing committee in HSTEDU |
2013-03-05 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2013-03-05 | House | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK |
2013-03-05 | House | Senate/ to House in HCLERK |
2013-03-05 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in HCLERK |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in S3RD |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in S3RD |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in S2ND |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ circled in S2ND |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in SSTBUS |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTBUS |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in SSTBUS |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Senate Comm - Held in SSTBUS |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation in SSTBUS |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note in SSTBUS |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTBUS |
2013-02-11 | Senate | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in SSTRUL |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SSTRUL |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO |
2013-02-04 | Numbered Bill Publically Distributed in LRGC | |
2013-02-04 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Same As/Similar To
SB0059S02 (Replaced by) 2013-04-01 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
SB0059 (Replaces) 2013-02-21 - Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in SSUB
SB0059 (Replaces) 2013-02-21 - Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in SSUB