UT SB0056 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-09 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-09 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Animal Shelter Amendments
Title
Animal Shelter Amendments
Sponsors
Sen. Peter Knudson [R] | Rep. Lee Perry [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-03 - House - House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed (Y: 4 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-03-03 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2 (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed (Y: 4 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-02-24 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 19 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 21 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2 (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed (Y: 4 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-02-24 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 19 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 21 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-09 | Senate | Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate Secretary |
2017-03-09 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2017-03-09 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2017-03-07 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House Rules Committee |
2017-03-07 | House | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules/ amended in House Rules Committee |
2017-03-06 | House | House Comm - Returned to Rules in House Government Operations Committee |
2017-03-03 | House | House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed in House Government Operations Committee |
2017-03-03 | House | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2 in House Government Operations Committee |
2017-03-02 | House | House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed in House Government Operations Committee |
2017-02-24 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Government Operations Committee |
2017-02-24 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2017-02-24 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2017-02-24 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2017-02-24 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Senate Comm - Not Considered in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2017-01-12 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2016-12-21 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2016-12-21 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2016-12-20 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |