UT SB0053S02 | 2014 | Regular Session

Note: Replaces legislation SB0053S01

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-01 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Amendments to Private Investigator Regulations

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amendments to Private Investigator Regulations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-13 - Senate - Senate/ concurs with House amendment (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 39 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House Comm - Returned to Rules (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2014-02-13 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - Senate/ substituted (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 21 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-01 Governor Signed in LTGOV
2014-03-21 Senate/ to Governor in EGOV
2014-03-21SenateSenate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in SSEC
2014-03-20SenateSenate/ enrolled bill to Printing in SSEC
2014-03-20SenateEnrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in SSEC
2014-03-18 Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN
2014-03-16 Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in LRGCEN
2014-03-13 Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN
2014-03-13SenateSenate/ received from House in SPRES
2014-03-13SenateHouse/ to Senate in SPRES
2014-03-13SenateHouse/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in SPRES
2014-03-13HouseHouse/ received from Senate in HSPKR
2014-03-13HouseSenate/ to House in HSPKR
2014-03-13HouseSenate/ concurs with House amendment in HSPKR
2014-03-13SenateSenate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in SCURCAL
2014-03-13SenateSenate/ received from House in SSEC
2014-03-13SenateHouse/ to Senate in SSEC
2014-03-13SenateHouse/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC
2014-03-13HouseHouse/ floor amendment in H3RDSB
2014-03-13HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in H3RDSB
2014-03-12HouseHouse/ 2nd suspended in H3RDSB
2014-03-12HouseHouse/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in H3RDSB
2014-03-10HouseHouse/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in HSTRUL
2014-03-10HouseHouse Comm - Returned to Rules in HSTGOC
2014-03-04HouseHouse Comm - Not Considered in HSTGOC
2014-02-27HouseHouse/ to standing committee in HSTGOC
2014-02-26HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in HSTRUL
2014-02-26HouseHouse/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in HSTEDW
2014-02-25HouseHouse Comm - Returned to Rules in HSTEDW
2014-02-19HouseHouse/ to standing committee in HSTEDW
2014-02-18HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL
2014-02-18HouseHouse/ received from Senate in HCLERK
2014-02-18HouseSenate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HCLERK
2014-02-18HouseLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HCLERK
2014-02-13HouseSenate/ to House in HCLERK
2014-02-13HouseSenate/ passed 3rd reading in HCLERK
2014-02-13SenateSenate/ substituted in S3RD
2014-02-13SenateSenate/ uncircled in S3RD
2014-02-13SenateLFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in S3RD
2014-02-12SenateSenate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in S3RD
2014-02-12SenateSenate/ circled in S3RD
2014-02-12SenateSenate/ 3rd reading in S3RD
2014-02-11SenateSenate/ passed 2nd reading in S3RD
2014-02-11SenateSenate/ 2nd reading in S2ND
2014-02-07SenateSenate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND
2014-02-07SenateSenate/ comm rpt/ substituted in SSTGOP
2014-02-06SenateBill Substituted by Standing Committee in SSTGOP
2014-02-06SenateSenate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTGOP
2014-02-06SenateSenate Comm - Substitute Recommendation in SSTGOP
2014-02-05SenateSenate/ to standing committee in SSTGOP
2014-02-05SenateSenate/ lifted from Rules in SSTRUL
2014-02-05SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL
2014-02-05SenateSenate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO
2014-02-04 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in LRGC
2014-02-04 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC

Same As/Similar To

SB0053S01 (Replaces) 2014-02-13 - Senate/ substituted in SSUB

Subjects


Utah State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://le.utah.gov/~2014/htmdoc/sbillhtm/SB0053S02.htm
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2014/bills/sbillint/sb0053s02.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2014/bills/sbillamd/sb0053s02.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2014/bills/sbillenr/sb0053.pdf
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/asp/votes/comvotes.asp?sessionid=2014GS&voteid=2983&sequence=7590
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=245&house=S&sessionid=2014GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=259&house=S&sessionid=2014GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=305&house=S&sessionid=2014GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=306&house=S&sessionid=2014GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=307&house=S&sessionid=2014GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/asp/votes/comvotes.asp?sessionid=2014GS&voteid=3440&sequence=13137
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=1203&house=H&sessionid=2014GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=1204&house=H&sessionid=2014GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=1631&house=S&sessionid=2014GS

Bill Comments

feedback