UT SB0053S01 | 2014 | Regular Session
Note: Replaces legislation SB0053
Note: Legislation replaced by SB0053S02
Note: Legislation replaced by SB0053S02
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-13 - Senate/ substituted in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-13 - Senate/ substituted in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amendments to Private Investigator Regulations
Title
Amendments to Private Investigator Regulations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-13 - Senate - Senate/ substituted (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 21 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2014-02-13 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 21 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-13 | Senate | Senate/ substituted in SSUB |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in S3RD |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in S3RD |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Senate/ circled in S3RD |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in S3RD |
2014-02-12 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in S3RD |
2014-02-11 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in S3RD |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in S3RD |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in SSTGOP |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in SSTGOP |
2014-02-06 | Senate | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in SSTGOP |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTGOP |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation in SSTGOP |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTGOP |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Senate/ lifted from Rules in SSTRUL |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO |
2014-02-04 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in LRGC | |
2014-02-04 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Same As/Similar To
SB0053 (Replaces) 2014-02-07 - Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in SSUB
SB0053S02 (Replaced by) 2014-04-01 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
SB0053S02 (Replaced by) 2014-04-01 - Governor Signed in LTGOV