UT SB0052S01 | 2013 | Regular Session
Note: Replaces legislation SB0052
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-14 - Senate/ filed in SFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-14 - Senate/ filed in SFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Game Fowl Fighting Amendments
Title
Game Fowl Fighting Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-14 - House - House/ failed (Y: 28 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2013-03-05 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 19 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - Senate - Senate/ floor amendment failed (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-04 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 17 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2013-03-05 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 19 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - Senate - Senate/ floor amendment failed (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-04 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 17 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-14 | Senate | Senate/ filed in SFILE |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in SSEC |
2013-03-14 | Senate | House/ to Senate in SSEC |
2013-03-14 | House | House/ failed in HCLERK |
2013-03-14 | House | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDSB |
2013-03-12 | House | House/ 2nd reading/ suspension in H3RDSB |
2013-03-12 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in H3RDSB |
2013-03-06 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2013-03-06 | House | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK |
2013-03-05 | House | Senate/ to House in HCLERK |
2013-03-05 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in HCLERK |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ floor amendment failed in S3RD |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in S3RD |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in S3RD |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in S2ND |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ circled in S2ND |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in S2ND |
2013-02-19 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in S2ND |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in SSTJLC |
2013-02-18 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SSTJLC |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in SSTJLC |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTJLC |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation in SSTJLC |
2013-02-14 | Senate | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in SSTJLC |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Senate Comm - Held in SSTJLC |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation in SSTJLC |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SSTJLC |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Senate Comm - Not Considered in SSTJLC |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTJLC |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO |
2013-01-29 | Numbered Bill Publically Distributed in LRGC | |
2013-01-29 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Same As/Similar To
SB0052 (Replaces) 2013-02-19 - Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in SSUB