UT SB0045 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Compulsory Education Revisions
Title
Compulsory Education Revisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-10 - House - House/ failed (Y: 32 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2016-03-09 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 39 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 22 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-29 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-29 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-29 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-29 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 39 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 22 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-29 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-29 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-29 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-29 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate Secretary |
2016-03-10 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2016-03-10 | House/ failed in Clerk of the House | |
2016-03-10 | House Motion to Adopt Joint Conference Comm Rpt in Conference Committee | |
2016-03-10 | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Conference Committee | |
2016-03-09 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Conference Committee | |
2016-03-09 | Bill Substituted by Conference Committee in Conference Committee | |
2016-03-09 | Senate/ to House in Conference Committee | |
2016-03-09 | Senate Conference Committee Appointed Meeting Information in Conference Committee | |
2016-03-09 | Senate/ received from House in Conference Committee | |
2016-03-09 | House/ to Senate in Conference Committee | |
2016-03-09 | House Conference Committee Appointed Meeting Information in Conference Committee | |
2016-03-09 | House/ refused to recede from House amendment in Clerk of the House | |
2016-03-09 | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House | |
2016-03-09 | Senate/ refuse to concur with House amendments in Clerk of the House | |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in Senate Concurrence Calendar |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate Secretary |
2016-03-09 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2016-03-09 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2016-03-09 | House | House/ substitute adoption failed from # 2 to # 3 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2016-03-09 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2016-03-09 | House | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2016-03-09 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2016-03-09 | House | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2016-03-08 | House | House/ return to Rules due to fiscal impact in House Rules Committee |
2016-03-08 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2016-03-08 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted in House Education Committee |
2016-03-08 | House | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in House Education Committee |
2016-03-08 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Education Committee |
2016-03-08 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation in House Education Committee |
2016-03-04 | House | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Education Committee |
2016-03-02 | House | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in House Education Committee |
2016-03-02 | House | House Comm - Held in House Education Committee |
2016-02-18 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Education Committee |
2016-02-17 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2016-02-17 | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House | |
2016-02-17 | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House | |
2016-02-17 | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House | |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Education Committee |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Education Committee |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Education Committee |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2016-01-14 | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate | |
2016-01-08 | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate | |
2015-12-21 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2015-12-17 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |