UT SB0036 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-01-25 - Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-01-25 - Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concealed Firearm Act Amendments
Title
Concealed Firearm Act Amendments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-25 | Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in SSUB | |
2011-01-25 | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation in SSTJLC | |
2011-01-24 | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SSTRUL | |
2011-01-22 | Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note in SINTRO | |
2011-01-21 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SINTRO | |
2011-01-13 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2011-01-13 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2011/htmdoc/sbillhtm/SB0036.htm |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2011/bills/sbillint/sb0036.pdf |