UT SB0028 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-01 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-01 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Boards and Commissions Amendments
Title
Boards and Commissions Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-22 - Senate - Senate/ concurs with House amendment (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - House - House/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - House - House/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - House - House/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-01-31 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - Senate - Senate/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - Senate - Senate/ floor amendment failed (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-01-30 - Senate - Senate/ floor amendment failed (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-01-30 - Senate - Senate/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - House - House/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - House - House/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - House - House/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-01-31 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - Senate - Senate/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - Senate - Senate/ floor amendment failed (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-01-30 - Senate - Senate/ floor amendment failed (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-01-30 - Senate - Senate/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-01 | Governor Signed in ELTGOV | |
2013-03-21 | Senate/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in SSEC |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in SSEC |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in SSEC |
2013-02-26 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2013-02-25 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in LRGCEN | |
2013-02-25 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in LRGCEN | |
2013-02-25 | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in LRGCEN | |
2013-02-25 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2013-02-25 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in SPRES |
2013-02-25 | Senate | House/ to Senate in SPRES |
2013-02-25 | Senate | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in SPRES |
2013-02-25 | House | House/ received from Senate in HSPKR |
2013-02-22 | House | Senate/ to House in HSPKR |
2013-02-22 | House | Senate/ concurs with House amendment in HSPKR |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in SCURCAL |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in SSEC |
2013-02-20 | Senate | House/ to Senate in SSEC |
2013-02-20 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC |
2013-02-20 | House | House/ floor amendment in H3RDSB |
2013-02-20 | House | House/ floor amendment in H3RDSB |
2013-02-20 | House | House/ uncircled in H3RDSB |
2013-02-13 | House | House/ circled in H3RDSB |
2013-02-13 | House | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDSB |
2013-02-08 | House | House/ 2nd reading in H3RDSB |
2013-02-08 | House | House/ committee report favorable in HSTGOC |
2013-02-07 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTGOC |
2013-02-05 | House | House/ to standing committee in HSTGOC |
2013-02-01 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2013-02-01 | House | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK |
2013-01-31 | House | Senate/ to House in HCLERK |
2013-01-31 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in HCLERK |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in S3RD |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in S3RD |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Senate/ floor amendment in S2ND |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Senate/ floor amendment failed in S2ND |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Senate/ floor amendment failed in S2ND |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Senate/ floor amendment in S2ND |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in S2ND |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Senate/ circled in S2ND |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in SSTRUL |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SINTRO |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO |
2012-12-20 | Numbered Bill Publically Distributed in LRGC | |
2012-12-12 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC | |
2012-11-20 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2012-11-20 | LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis in LRGC |