UT SB0015 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-26 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-26 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Industrial Accident Restricted Account
Title
Industrial Accident Restricted Account
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-11 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2013-01-30 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2013-01-30 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-26 | Governor Signed in ELTGOV | |
2013-03-21 | Senate/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in SSEC |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in SSEC |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in SSEC |
2013-02-14 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2013-02-12 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2013-02-12 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in SPRES |
2013-02-11 | Senate | House/ to Senate in SPRES |
2013-02-11 | Senate | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in SPRES |
2013-02-11 | House | House/ passed 3rd reading in HSPKR |
2013-02-11 | House | House/ 3rd reading in HCON |
2013-02-07 | House | House/ 2nd reading in HCON |
2013-02-07 | House | House/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in HSTBUS |
2013-02-06 | House | House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in HSTBUS |
2013-02-06 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTBUS |
2013-02-05 | House | House/ to standing committee in HSTBUS |
2013-01-30 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2013-01-30 | House | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK |
2013-01-30 | House | Senate/ to House in HCLERK |
2013-01-30 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in HCLERK |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in S3RD |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in S3RD |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in S3RD |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in SSTRUL |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO |
2013-01-07 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in LRGC | |
2012-12-20 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2012-12-20 | Numbered Bill Publically Distributed in LRGC | |
2012-12-12 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC | |
2012-11-05 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in LRGC |