UT SB0007 | 2013 | Regular Session
Note: Legislation replaced by SB0007S02
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-12 - House/ substituted in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-12 - House/ substituted in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
State Agency and Higher Education Compensation Appropriations
Title
State Agency and Higher Education Compensation Appropriations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-12 - House - House/ substituted (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - House - House/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - House - House/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-12 | House | House/ substituted in HSUB |
2013-03-12 | House | House/ uncircled in H3RDSB |
2013-03-12 | House | House/ circled in H3RDSB |
2013-03-12 | House | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDSB |
2013-03-12 | House | House/ 2nd reading/ suspension in H3RDSB |
2013-03-12 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in H3RDSB |
2013-03-12 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2013-03-12 | House | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK |
2013-03-12 | House | Senate/ to House in HCLERK |
2013-03-12 | House | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in HCLERK |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in S2ND |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SSTRUL |
2013-03-11 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTRUL |
2013-03-11 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SSTRUL |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2013-03-11 | Numbered Bill Publically Distributed in LRGC | |
2013-03-11 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC | |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO |
2013-02-25 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |
Same As/Similar To
SB0007S02 (Replaced by) 2013-04-01 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV