UT SB0001 | 2022 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-02 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-02 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Higher Education Base Budget
Title
Higher Education Base Budget
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-27 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-02 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2022-02-01 | Senate/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Senate Secretary |
2022-02-01 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2022-02-01 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary |
2022-01-31 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2022-01-31 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2022-01-28 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2022-01-27 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2022-01-27 | Senate | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President |
2022-01-27 | House | House/ passed 3rd reading in House Speaker |
2022-01-27 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2022-01-27 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2022-01-27 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2022-01-27 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2022-01-26 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2022-01-26 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2022-01-26 | House | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Clerk of the House |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Senate/ lifted from Rules in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2022-01-17 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-01-17 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-01-17 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-01-17 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-01-17 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |