UT HR0005 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 13 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-14 - House/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 13 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-14 - House/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
House Resolution on Trade Relations with Israel
Title
House Resolution on Trade Relations with Israel
Sponsors
Rep. Ken Ivory [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-07 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-14 | House/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2018-03-13 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House |
2018-03-13 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House |
2018-03-08 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2018-03-08 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2018-03-07 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2018-03-07 | House | House/ passed 3rd reading in House Speaker |
2018-03-07 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House Consent Calendar |
2018-03-05 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House Consent Calendar |
2018-03-05 | House | House/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in House Business and Labor Committee |
2018-03-05 | House | House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in House Business and Labor Committee |
2018-03-05 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Business and Labor Committee |
2018-03-01 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Business and Labor Committee |
2018-03-01 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2018-03-01 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House |
2018-03-01 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2018-02-28 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2018-02-28 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2018-02-28 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2018-02-28 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |