UT HJR014 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-02 - House/ substituted in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-02 - House/ substituted in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Urging Passage of the Market Equity Act of 2011 and the Marketplace Fairness Act
Title
Joint Resolution Urging Passage of the Market Equity Act of 2011 and the Marketplace Fairness Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-22 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-02 | House/ substituted in HSUB | |
2012-03-02 | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB | |
2012-03-01 | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in HSTRUL | |
2012-02-29 | House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules in HSTRUL | |
2012-02-23 | House/ 2nd reading in H3RDHB | |
2012-02-23 | House/ comm rpt/ amended in HSTPUT | |
2012-02-23 | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HSTPUT | |
2012-02-22 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTPUT | |
2012-02-22 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTPUT | |
2012-02-22 | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTPUT | |
2012-02-22 | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation in HSTPUT | |
2012-02-22 | House/ to standing committee in HSTPUT | |
2012-02-22 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2012-02-22 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK | |
2012-02-21 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2012-02-21 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2012-02-21 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC | |
2012-02-04 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2012-02-04 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2012-02-03 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |