UT HJR012 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 14 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-21 - House/ to Lieutenant Governor in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 14 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-21 - House/ to Lieutenant Governor in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Dissolving Clarkston Justice Court
Title
Joint Resolution Dissolving Clarkston Justice Court
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-13 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2013-03-04 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-03-07 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2013-03-04 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-21 | House/ to Lieutenant Governor in ELTGOV | |
2013-03-14 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in HCLERK |
2013-03-14 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in HCLERK |
2013-03-14 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2013-03-13 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2013-03-13 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2013-03-13 | House | House/ received from Senate in HSPKR |
2013-03-13 | House | Senate/ to House in HSPKR |
2013-03-13 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in HSPKR |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in SPRES |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in SCON |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in SCON |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in SSTGOP |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in SSTGOP |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTGOP |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTGOP |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in SINTRO |
2013-03-04 | Senate | House/ to Senate in SSEC |
2013-03-04 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC |
2013-03-04 | House | House/ 3rd reading in HCON |
2013-03-01 | House | House/ 2nd reading in HCON |
2013-03-01 | House | House/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in HSTGOC |
2013-03-01 | House | House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in HSTGOC |
2013-03-01 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTGOC |
2013-02-26 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HSTGOC |
2013-02-26 | House | House/ to standing committee in HSTGOC |
2013-02-26 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL |
2013-02-25 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTRUL |
2013-02-21 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2013-02-20 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK |
2013-02-20 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2013-02-20 | Numbered Bill Publically Distributed in LRGC | |
2013-02-20 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |