UT HJR001 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-02 - House/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-02 - House/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Green Schools Joint Resolution
Title
Green Schools Joint Resolution
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-02 | House/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended in HSUB | |
2012-02-01 | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in HSTPUT | |
2012-02-01 | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation in HSTPUT | |
2012-01-24 | House Comm - Not Considered in HSTPUT | |
2012-01-23 | House/ to standing committee in HSTPUT | |
2012-01-23 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2012-01-20 | House/ received bill from Legislative Printing in HCLERK | |
2012-01-13 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in LRGC | |
2012-01-11 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in LRGC | |
2012-01-05 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2012-01-05 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2012-01-05 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2012/htmdoc/hbillhtm/HJR001.htm |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2012/bills/hbillint/hjr001.pdf |