UT HJR001 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-11 - House/ strike enacting clause in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-11 - House/ strike enacting clause in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Amending Provision on Municipal Water Rights
Title
Joint Resolution Amending Provision on Municipal Water Rights
Sponsors
Rep. Kay McIff [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-11 | House/ strike enacting clause in HFILE | |
2010-03-02 | House Comm - Returned to Rules in HSTNAE | |
2010-02-08 | House/ to standing committee in HSTNAE | |
2010-01-19 | House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in HDOCKET | |
2009-12-22 | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in LRGC | |
2009-12-21 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in LRGC | |
2009-12-10 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC | |
2009-11-19 | LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis in LRGC |
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2010/htmdoc/hbillhtm/HJR001.htm |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2010/bills/hbillint/hjr001.pdf |