UT HCR001 | 2022 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-22 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-22 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concurrent Resolution to Work Together to Address the Climate, Public Lands, and Carbon Sequestration
Title
Concurrent Resolution to Work Together to Address the Climate, Public Lands, and Carbon Sequestration
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-18 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-22 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2022-02-22 | House/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2022-02-21 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House |
2022-02-21 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House |
2022-02-21 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2022-02-21 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2022-02-18 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2022-02-18 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2022-02-18 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2022-02-18 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Senate President |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2022-02-10 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2022-02-10 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2022-02-10 | House | House/ uncircled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-02-10 | House | House/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-02-10 | House | House/ substituted from # 0 to # 1 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-02-10 | House | House/ uncircled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-02-09 | House | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-02-04 | House | House/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-02-04 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-01-31 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-01-31 | House | House/ committee report favorable in House Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2022-01-28 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2022-01-26 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2022-01-18 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2022-01-12 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House |
2022-01-12 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2021-12-13 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-12-13 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |