UT HB3004 | 2024 | 3rd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-21 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-21 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Energy Security Adjustments
Title
Energy Security Adjustments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-19 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-06-19 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 66 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-06-19 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 66 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-21 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2024-06-21 | House/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2024-06-21 | House | House/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Clerk of the House |
2024-06-20 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House |
2024-06-20 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House |
2024-06-20 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2024-06-20 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2024-06-19 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2024-06-19 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2024-06-19 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2024-06-19 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker |
2024-06-19 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate President |
2024-06-19 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2024-06-19 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2024-06-19 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2024-06-19 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2024-06-19 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2024-06-19 | House | House/ substituted from # 0 to # 1 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2024-06-19 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2024-06-19 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2024-06-19 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2024-06-19 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2024-06-19 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Printing in Clerk of the House |
2024-06-19 | House | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2024-06-19 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2024-06-17 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2024-06-17 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 13 | 317 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13 | 318 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13 | 320 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 109 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63C | 26 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63C | 26 | 201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63C | 26 | 202 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63I | 1 | 211 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63I | 1 | 263 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
79 | 6 | 401 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
79 | 6 | 407 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
79 | 6 | 408 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |