UT HB0553 | 2024 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-01 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-01 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reverse-keyword Information Prohibition
Title
Reverse-keyword Information Prohibition
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Wilcox [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-01 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2024-03-01 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2024-02-27 | House | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in House Rules Committee |
2024-02-27 | House | House Comm - Returned to Rules in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-02-21 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-02-19 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2024-02-15 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2024-02-15 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2024-02-15 | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2024-02-15 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2024-02-15 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2024-02-15 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Business
Courts
Electronic Databases
Electronic Information
Electronic Privacy
Government Records
Internet Protocols
Judicial Operations
Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice
Public Utilities and Technology
Technology
Courts
Electronic Databases
Electronic Information
Electronic Privacy
Government Records
Internet Protocols
Judicial Operations
Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice
Public Utilities and Technology
Technology
Code Citations
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2024/bills/static/HB0553.html |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2024/bills/hbillint/HB0553.pdf |
Supplement | https://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2024/HB0553.fn.pdf |