UT HB0483 | 2022 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Department of Commerce Electronic Payment Fees
Title
Department of Commerce Electronic Payment Fees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2022-03-04 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2022-03-02 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2022-03-02 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Rules Committee |
2022-02-24 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2022-02-24 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2022-02-24 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-02-24 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-02-24 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
13 | 1 | 2 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63J | 1 | 602 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2022/bills/static/HB0483.html |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2022/bills/hbillint/HB0483.pdf |
Supplement | https://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2022/HB0483.fn.pdf |