UT HB0450 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Wastewater Reuse Amendments
Title
Wastewater Reuse Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-01 - House - House Comm - Held (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2018-03-08 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2018-03-06 | House | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules/ substituted in House Rules Committee |
2018-03-05 | House | House Comm - Returned to Rules in House Business and Labor Committee |
2018-03-05 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Business and Labor Committee |
2018-03-03 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Business and Labor Committee |
2018-03-01 | House | House Comm - Held in House Business and Labor Committee |
2018-03-01 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in House Business and Labor Committee |
2018-02-27 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Business and Labor Committee |
2018-02-26 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Business and Labor Committee |
2018-02-22 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2018-02-22 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2018-02-21 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2018-02-21 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |