UT HB0440 | 2019 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commission on Criminal and Juvenile Justice Amendments
Title
Commission on Criminal and Juvenile Justice Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2019-03-22 | House/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2019-03-22 | House | House/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Clerk of the House |
2019-03-22 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House |
2019-03-22 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House |
2019-03-15 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2019-03-15 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2019-03-13 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2019-03-13 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2019-03-13 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2019-03-13 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate President |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2019-03-11 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2019-03-08 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Senate/ lifted from Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2019-03-08 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2019-03-08 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2019-03-08 | House | House/ uncircled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2019-03-08 | House | House/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2019-03-08 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2019-03-07 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2019-03-07 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended in House Judiciary Committee |
2019-03-07 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2019-03-07 | House | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules/ substituted/ amend in House Rules Committee |
2019-03-07 | House | House/ committee report favorable in House Judiciary Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Judiciary Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2 in House Judiciary Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in House Judiciary Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in House Judiciary Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Judiciary Committee |
2019-03-04 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2019-02-28 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2019-02-28 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2019-02-27 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2019-02-27 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Code of Criminal Procedure
Department of Corrections
Department of Public Safety
Judiciary
Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice
Victims' Rights
Department of Corrections
Department of Public Safety
Judiciary
Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice
Victims' Rights