UT HB0422 | 2022 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
School District Voter Eligibility Amendments
Title
School District Voter Eligibility Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-28 - House - House/ failed (Y: 29 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-25 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2022-03-04 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2022-02-28 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2022-02-28 | House | House/ failed in Clerk of the House |
2022-02-28 | House | House/ uncircled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-02-25 | House | House/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-02-25 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-02-25 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-02-25 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted in House Government Operations Committee |
2022-02-25 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Government Operations Committee |
2022-02-25 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in House Government Operations Committee |
2022-02-23 | House | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in House Government Operations Committee |
2022-02-22 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Government Operations Committee |
2022-02-22 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Government Operations Committee |
2022-02-22 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2022-02-17 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2022-02-17 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2022-02-16 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-02-16 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Education
Election Law
Government Operations (State Issues)
K-12 Education
School Districts
Voting and Voter Registration
Election Law
Government Operations (State Issues)
K-12 Education
School Districts
Voting and Voter Registration
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20A | 1 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
20A | 14 | 203 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
20A | 2 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
20A | 2 | 104 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
20A | 2 | 204 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
20A | 2 | 302 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
20A | 2 | 304 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
20A | 6 | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63G | 2 | 302 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |