UT HB0411 | 2019 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Community Renewable Energy Act
Title
Community Renewable Energy Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 48 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 1 to # 2 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed (Y: 5 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-06 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 48 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 1 to # 2 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed (Y: 5 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-06 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2019-03-21 | House/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2019-03-21 | House | House/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Clerk of the House |
2019-03-21 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House |
2019-03-21 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House |
2019-03-15 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2019-03-15 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2019-03-14 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2019-03-14 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2019-03-14 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2019-03-14 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate President |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2019-03-11 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2019-03-11 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2019-03-11 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2019-03-11 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2019-03-10 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2019-03-08 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2019-03-08 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted in House Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2019-03-08 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2019-03-08 | House | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules/ substituted in House Rules Committee |
2019-03-08 | House | House/ committee report favorable in House Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2019-03-07 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2019-03-07 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 1 to # 2 in House Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed in House Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in House Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2019-03-01 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2019-02-28 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2019-02-26 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2019-02-26 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2019-02-25 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2019-02-25 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Counties
Division of Public Utilities
Electricity
Energy
Environmental Quality
Local Governments
Municipal Government
Office of Consumer Services
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
Public Service Commission
Public Utilities
Renewable Energy
Solar Power
Thermal Power
Wind Power
Division of Public Utilities
Electricity
Energy
Environmental Quality
Local Governments
Municipal Government
Office of Consumer Services
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
Public Service Commission
Public Utilities
Renewable Energy
Solar Power
Thermal Power
Wind Power