UT HB0399 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-14 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-14 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Corporation Amendments
Title
Corporation Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-03 - House - House/ concurs with Senate amendment (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-14 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2023-03-13 | House/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2023-03-13 | House | House/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Clerk of the House |
2023-03-10 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House |
2023-03-10 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House |
2023-03-06 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2023-03-06 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2023-03-03 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2023-03-03 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2023-03-03 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2023-03-03 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2023-03-03 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2023-03-03 | Senate | House/ concurs with Senate amendment in Senate President |
2023-03-02 | House | House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in House Concurrence Calendar |
2023-03-02 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2023-03-02 | House | Senate/ to House with amendments in Clerk of the House |
2023-03-02 | House | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Clerk of the House |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Senate/ substituted from # 2 to # 3 in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2023-03-02 | Senate | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2023-03-01 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate Rules Committee |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2 in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2023-02-15 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2023-02-15 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2023-02-15 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House Consent Calendar |
2023-02-13 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House Consent Calendar |
2023-02-13 | House | House/ comm rpt/ amended/ placed on Consent Cal in House Business and Labor Committee |
2023-02-13 | House | House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in House Business and Labor Committee |
2023-02-13 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Business and Labor Committee |
2023-02-13 | House | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in House Business and Labor Committee |
2023-02-10 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Business and Labor Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House |
2023-02-07 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2023-02-06 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2023-02-06 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Business
Business Entities
Charities
Commerce and Trade
Corporations
Department of Commerce
Governmental Nonprofit Corporations
State Tax Commission
Business Entities
Charities
Commerce and Trade
Corporations
Department of Commerce
Governmental Nonprofit Corporations
State Tax Commission