UT HB0394 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-14 - House/ filed in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-14 - House/ filed in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Outdoor Wood Boilers
Title
Outdoor Wood Boilers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-14 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 59 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2013-03-11 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 59 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-14 | House | House/ filed in HFILE |
2013-03-14 | House | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Senate/ to House in SSEC |
2013-03-14 | House | Senate/ strike enacting clause in HCLERK |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Senate/ circled in S2ND |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in SINTRO |
2013-03-11 | Senate | House/ to Senate in SSEC |
2013-03-11 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC |
2013-03-11 | House | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB |
2013-03-08 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in H3RDHB |
2013-03-08 | House | House/ 2nd reading/ returned to Rules in HSTRUL |
2013-03-08 | House | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in HSTNAE |
2013-03-07 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTNAE |
2013-03-06 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HSTNAE |
2013-03-05 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTNAE |
2013-03-05 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTNAE |
2013-03-05 | House | House/ to standing committee in HSTNAE |
2013-03-04 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2013-03-04 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK |
2013-03-04 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2013-03-04 | Numbered Bill Publically Distributed in LRGC | |
2013-03-04 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |