UT HB0378 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-19 - Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in HSTBUS
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-19 - Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in HSTBUS
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Motor Vehicle Insurance Requirements
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance Requirements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-19 | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in HSTBUS | |
2010-02-17 | House/ to standing committee in HSTBUS | |
2010-02-17 | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in HSTRUL | |
2010-02-17 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTRUL | |
2010-02-16 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HDOCKET | |
2010-02-12 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2010-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2010-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2010/htmdoc/hbillhtm/HB0378.htm |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2010/bills/hbillint/hb0378.pdf |