UT HB0372 | 2013 | Regular Session

Note: Legislation replaced by HB0372S02

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-11 - House/ substituted in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Cigarette, Tobacco, and Nicotine Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cigarette, Tobacco, and Nicotine Amendments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-03-11 - House - House/ substituted (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-11HouseHouse/ substituted in HSUB
2013-03-11HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB
2013-03-08HouseHouse/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in H3RDHB
2013-03-07HouseHouse/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules in HSTRUL
2013-03-07HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in H3RDHB
2013-03-07HouseHouse/ comm rpt/ amended in HSTHHS
2013-03-06HouseHouse Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTHHS
2013-03-06HouseHouse Comm - Amendment Recommendation in HSTHHS
2013-03-05HouseHouse/ to standing committee in HSTHHS
2013-03-04HouseHouse/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HSTRUL
2013-03-04HouseLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL
2013-03-01HouseLFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTRUL
2013-02-26HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL
2013-02-26HouseHouse/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK
2013-02-26 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC
2013-02-26 Numbered Bill Publically Distributed in LRGC
2013-02-26 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC

Same As/Similar To

HB0372S02 (Replaced by) 2013-03-13 - House/ filed in HFILE

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback